Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB919 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kacal, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 919
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to workers' compensation insurance coverage for certain
 intrastate fire mutual aid system team members and regional
 incident management team members.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 88, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 88.126 to read as follows:
 Sec. 88.126.  WORKERS' COMPENSATION INSURANCE COVERAGE:
 INTRASTATE FIRE MUTUAL AID SYSTEM AND REGIONAL INCIDENT MANAGEMENT
 TEAMS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Intrastate fire mutual aid system team" means an
 intrastate fire mutual aid system team established under the state
 emergency management plan under Section 418.042, Government Code,
 or the statewide mutual aid program for fire emergencies under
 Section 418.110, Government Code, and coordinated by the Texas A&M
 Forest Service to assist the state with fire suppression and
 all-hazard emergency response activities before and following a
 natural or man-made disaster.
 (2)  "Local government employee member" means a member
 employed by a local government, as defined by Section 102.001,
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 (3)  "Member" means an individual, other than an
 employee of The Texas A&M University System, who has been
 officially designated as a member of an intrastate fire mutual aid
 system team or a regional incident management team.
 (4)  "Nongovernment member" means a member who is not a
 state employee member, a local government employee member, or an
 employee of The Texas A&M University System.
 (5)  "Regional incident management team" means a
 regional incident management team established under Section 88.122
 or under the state emergency management plan under Section 418.042,
 Government Code, and coordinated by the Texas A&M Forest Service to
 assist the state with managing incident response activities before
 and following a natural or man-made disaster.
 (6)  "State employee member" means a member employed by
 an agency of the state other than a component of The Texas A&M
 University System.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, during any period in
 which an intrastate fire mutual aid system team or a regional
 incident management team is activated by the Texas Division of
 Emergency Management, or during any training session sponsored or
 sanctioned by the Texas Division of Emergency Management for an
 intrastate fire mutual aid system team or a regional incident
 management team, a participating nongovernment member or local
 government employee member is included in the coverage provided
 under Chapter 501, Labor Code, in the same manner as an employee, as
 defined by Section 501.001, Labor Code.
 (c)  Service with an intrastate fire mutual aid system team
 or a regional incident management team by a state employee member
 who is activated is considered to be in the course and scope of the
 employee's regular employment with the state.
 (d)  Service with an intrastate fire mutual aid system team
 or a regional incident management team by an employee of The Texas
 A&M University System is considered to be in the course and scope of
 the employee's regular employment with The Texas A&M University
 System.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 408.0445, Labor Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 408.0445.  AVERAGE WEEKLY WAGE FOR MEMBERS OF STATE
 MILITARY FORCES, [AND] TEXAS TASK FORCE 1, INTRASTATE FIRE MUTUAL
 AID SYSTEM TEAMS, AND REGIONAL INCIDENT MANAGEMENT TEAMS.
 SECTION 3.  Section 408.0445, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  For purposes of computing income benefits or death
 benefits under Section 88.126, Education Code, the average weekly
 wage of an intrastate fire mutual aid system team member or a
 regional incident management team member, as defined by Section
 88.126, Education Code, who is engaged in authorized training or
 duty is an amount equal to the sum of the member's regular weekly
 wage at any employment, including self-employment, that the member
 holds in addition to serving as a member of an intrastate fire
 mutual aid system team or a regional incident management team, as
 applicable, except that the amount may not exceed 100 percent of the
 state average weekly wage as determined under Section 408.047.  A
 member for whom an average weekly wage cannot be computed shall be
 paid the minimum weekly benefit established by the division.
 SECTION 4.  Section 501.001(5), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (5)  "Employee" means a person who is:
 (A)  in the service of the state pursuant to an
 election, appointment, or express oral or written contract of hire;
 (B)  paid from state funds but whose duties
 require that the person work and frequently receive supervision in
 a political subdivision of the state;
 (C)  a peace officer employed by a political
 subdivision, while the peace officer is exercising authority
 granted under:
 (i)  Article 2.12, Code of Criminal
 Procedure; or
 (ii)  Articles 14.03(d) and (g), Code of
 Criminal Procedure;
 (D)  a member of the state military forces, as
 defined by Section 437.001, Government Code, who is engaged in
 authorized training or duty; [or]
 (E)  a Texas Task Force 1 member, as defined by
 Section 88.301, Education Code, who is activated by the Texas
 Division of Emergency Management or is injured during training
 sponsored or sanctioned by Texas Task Force 1; or
 (F)  an intrastate fire mutual aid system team
 member or a regional incident management team member, as defined by
 Section 88.126, Education Code, who is activated by the Texas
 Division of Emergency Management or is injured during training
 sponsored or sanctioned by the Texas Division of Emergency
 Management on behalf of an intrastate fire mutual aid system team or
 a regional incident management team, as applicable.
 SECTION 5.  Section 501.002, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  For purposes of this chapter and Section 88.126,
 Education Code, the Texas A&M Forest Service shall perform all
 duties of an employer in relation to an intrastate fire mutual aid
 system team member or a regional incident management team member
 who is injured and receives benefits under this chapter.
 SECTION 6.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a claim for workers' compensation benefits based on a
 compensable injury that occurs on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A claim based on a compensable injury that occurs before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the compensable injury occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *