E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6061
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3793
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5624
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5624
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1947
|
Journal Page: 5624
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5624
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5624
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5561
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4819
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1906
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3270
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1165
|
Journal Page: 3270
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3270
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Israel
|
Journal Page: 3268
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3268
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3225
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3224
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
House
|
01/11/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|