LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB929
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB929
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB929
Compare Versions
HB929 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB929 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB929 Enrolled May 28, 2017
HB929 Comm Sub May 20, 2017
HB929 Engrossed May 11, 2017
HB929 Comm Sub April 13, 2017
HB929 Introduced January 11, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB929 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB929 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB929 Enrolled May 28, 2017
HB929 Comm Sub May 20, 2017
HB929 Engrossed May 11, 2017
HB929 Comm Sub April 13, 2017
HB929 Introduced January 11, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare