Senate | 05/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2558 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#770 | Journal Page: 2557 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2557 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2557 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2409 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#701 | Journal Page: 2408 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2408 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Amended | 2-Zerwas | Journal Page: 2408 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2408 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 401 | |
House | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 401 | |
House | 01/11/2017 | Filed |