Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB938 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Brazoria H.B. No. 938
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 518
 in Pearland as the Officer Endy Ekpanya Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  OFFICER ENDY EKPANYA MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)
 The portion of Farm-to-Market Road 518 in Pearland between its
 intersection with State Highway 35 and Sunset Meadows Drive is
 designated as the Officer Endy Ekpanya Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Officer Endy Ekpanya Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *