Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB943 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/11/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R5051 JG-D
 By: Howard H.B. No. 943


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Transgender Healthcare
 Advisory Committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Advisory committee" means the Transgender
 Healthcare Advisory Committee.
 (2)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (b)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall
 establish the Transgender Healthcare Advisory Committee to develop
 and provide recommendations on:
 (1)  the health care and insurance needs for persons
 who identify as transgender; and
 (2)  the adverse health impacts for patients who do not
 meet traditional gender standards under the Healthcare Common
 Procedure Coding System adopted by the Centers for Medicare &
 Medicaid Services of the United States Department of Health and
 Human Services or the American Medical Association's Current
 Procedural Terminology codes.
 (c)  The advisory committee is composed of 15 members
 appointed by the executive commissioner, unless otherwise
 provided, as follows:
 (1)  two representatives from a statewide or regional
 lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender or gender-identity
 advocacy organization;
 (2)  one physician with broad experience working with
 persons who identify as transgender;
 (3)  one representative from a lesbian, gay, bisexual,
 and transgender or gender-identity resource center;
 (4)  one representative from a statewide medical
 association;
 (5)  one representative from a statewide physicians'
 association;
 (6)  one representative from a statewide pediatric
 physicians' association;
 (7)  one representative from a statewide insurance
 association;
 (8)  one representative from the Health and Human
 Services Commission;
 (9)  one representative from the Department of State
 Health Services;
 (10)  one representative from the Department of Family
 and Protective Services;
 (11)  one representative from the Texas Department of
 Insurance, appointed by the commissioner of insurance;
 (12)  one representative from the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice, appointed by the executive director of the
 department;
 (13)  one representative from The University of Texas
 at Austin, Texas A&M University at College Station, or the
 University of Houston; and
 (14)  one representative from The University of Texas
 Health Science Center at Houston or The Texas A&M University Health
 Science Center.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall appoint a member of the
 advisory committee to serve as presiding officer.
 (e)  A vacancy on the advisory committee shall be filled in
 the same manner as the original appointment.
 (f)  A member of the advisory committee may not receive
 compensation for service on the advisory committee, but is entitled
 to reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses incurred in
 performing advisory committee duties. The advisory committee may
 accept gifts, grants, and donations to pay for those expenses.
 (g)  The advisory committee shall meet at least quarterly at
 the call of the presiding officer and at other times as determined
 by the presiding officer.
 (h)  The advisory committee shall develop recommendations to
 address:
 (1)  the health care and insurance needs for persons
 who identify as transgender;
 (2)  adverse health impacts for patients who do not
 meet traditional gender standards under the Healthcare Common
 Procedure Coding System adopted by the Centers for Medicare &
 Medicaid Services of the United States Department of Health and
 Human Services or the American Medical Association's Current
 Procedural Terminology codes and continuing education for health
 care professionals addressing those impacts; and
 (3)  the health care needs for inmates who identify as
 transgender in jails and prisons in this state.
 (i)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall provide
 administrative support for the advisory committee using existing
 resources.
 (j)  Not later than August 31, 2018, the advisory committee
 shall submit a final report to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 executive commissioner with its findings and recommendations
 described by Subsection (h) of this section.
 (k)  The advisory committee is abolished June 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2017, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission, the
 commissioner of insurance, and the executive director of the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall appoint members to the
 Transgender Healthcare Advisory Committee established under this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.