E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6061
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4819
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1899
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1899
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#755
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#693
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Amended
|
1-VanDeaver
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
01/12/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|