E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3887
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#253
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1470
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#234
|
Journal Page: 1469
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1469
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Cortez
|
Journal Page: 1469
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1469
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
01/12/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|