Senate | 05/23/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3272 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1167 | Journal Page: 3271 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3271 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3271 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3225 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3225 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 726 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 473 | |
House | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 473 | |
House | 01/12/2017 | Filed |