1 | 1 | | By: Murr, Moody (Senate Sponsor - RodrÃguez) H.B. No. 978 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2017; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
4 | 4 | | Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | 5 | | Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the terms of the board members of the Texas Indigent |
---|
12 | 12 | | Defense Commission. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 79.014(b), Government Code, is amended |
---|
15 | 15 | | to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (b) The board members serve staggered terms of six [two] |
---|
17 | 17 | | years, with one or two members' terms expiring February 1 of each |
---|
18 | 18 | | odd-numbered year [and three members' terms expiring February 1 of |
---|
19 | 19 | | each even-numbered year]. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. The members of the board of the Texas Indigent |
---|
21 | 21 | | Defense Commission serving on the effective date of this Act may |
---|
22 | 22 | | draw lots or use another method to determine the members who shall |
---|
23 | 23 | | serve terms that expire on February 1, 2023, the members who shall |
---|
24 | 24 | | serve terms that expire on February 1, 2021, and the members who |
---|
25 | 25 | | shall serve terms that expire on February 1, 2019. The members of |
---|
26 | 26 | | the board appointed to succeed the members serving on the effective |
---|
27 | 27 | | date of this Act shall serve six-year terms. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
29 | 29 | | * * * * * |
---|