Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB978 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R5357 MEW-D
 By: Murr, Moody H.B. No. 978


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the terms of the board members of the Texas Indigent
 Defense Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 79.014(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The board members serve staggered terms of six [two]
 years, with one or two members' terms expiring February 1 of each
 odd-numbered year [and three members' terms expiring February 1 of
 each even-numbered year].
 SECTION 2.  The members of the board of the Texas Indigent
 Defense Commission serving on the effective date of this Act may
 draw lots or use another method to determine the members who shall
 serve terms that expire on February 1, 2023, the members who shall
 serve terms that expire on February 1, 2021, and the members who
 shall serve terms that expire on February 1, 2019. The members of
 the board appointed to succeed the members serving on the effective
 date of this Act shall serve six-year terms.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.