Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB998 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Alvarado (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 998
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain information stored as
 part of the preparation of campaign finance reports required to be
 filed with the clerk of certain counties or municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 254.0401, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  Electronic report data saved in a temporary storage
 location of the authority with whom the report is filed for later
 retrieval and editing before the report is filed is confidential
 and may not be disclosed. After the report is filed with the
 authority, the information disclosed in the filed report is public
 information to the extent provided by this title.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *