E | 06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6065 | |
E | 05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6063 | |
Senate | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4237 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6032 | |
House | 05/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6040 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4833 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3054 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3054 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3054 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3054 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2018 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#728 | Journal Page: 2481 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2481 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2481 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2125 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 988 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed |