Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR121 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/02/2017

                            H.C.R. No. 121


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Salvador Sanchez Diaz of Edinburg on April 11, 2016, at
 the age of 86; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Antonio and Josefa Sanchez Diaz, Salvador
 Diaz served his country during the Korean War, and he was stationed
 in Germany; upon his return home, he attended Pan American College
 and earned his degree in accounting; he went on to work at Tide
 Products for 30 years, and he later retired from Wilbur-Ellis, at
 age 65; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Diaz married the former Minerva Ozuna on
 February 11, 1956, and over the course of their 60 years together,
 they had the privilege of watching their family grow to include
 three children, David and his wife, Judy, Rene and his wife, Arlene,
 and Elisa Diaz, and three grandchildren, Jacob, Alissa, and
 Abigail; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Diaz is further survived by his sister, Elena
 Diaz Ramos, and his siblings-in-law, Santos Roel Ozuna and his
 wife, Tammie, Criselda Ozuna, Victoria O. Gadd, and Viola O. Mathis
 and her husband, Dennis, as well as numerous nieces and nephews; and
 WHEREAS, After their children were grown, Mr. and Mrs. Diaz
 enjoyed traveling to national parks across the country, with
 Mr. Diaz doing all the driving; and
 WHEREAS, While the death of Salvador Sanchez Diaz brings
 great sorrow to his family and friends, he will forever be
 remembered with great admiration and affection by all those who
 held him dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Salvador Sanchez Diaz of Edinburg
 and extend sincere condolences to his loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Salvador Sanchez Diaz.
 Canales
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 121 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 27, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 121 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on May 1, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor