05/18/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/08/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Referred to House Administration | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Filed |