06/01/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/25/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Filed |