E | 02/06/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 245 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 179 | |
House | 02/06/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 229 | |
House | 02/01/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 225 | |
House | 01/30/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 106 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 106 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 106 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 106 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 104 | |
House | 01/24/2017 | Record vote | RV#18 | Journal Page: 173 |
House | 01/24/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 173 | |
House | 01/24/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 173 | |
House | 01/24/2017 | Filed |