E | 05/23/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4837 | |
E | 05/16/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3665 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2001 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3603 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3387 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1606 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1606 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1237 | |
House | 04/21/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#320 | Journal Page: 1699 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1699 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1699 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 807 | |
House | 03/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 582 | |
House | 01/30/2017 | Filed |