Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR53 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017