E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5565
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4573
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1487
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#240
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
House
|
02/01/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|