Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR59 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017