E | 05/04/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2760 | |
E | 04/26/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2074 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1265 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1800 | |
House | 04/21/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1804 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1177 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1115 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1019 | |
House | 02/17/2017 | Filed |