Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR76 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/21/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 76


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, U.S. Army Master Sergeant Roy Perez Benavidez built
 a distinguished military career that spanned nearly a quarter
 century, and his bravery and self-sacrifice in the service of his
 fellow Americans have become legendary; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Salvador Benavidez and Teresa Perez, Roy
 Benavidez was born in Lindenau on August 5, 1935; he answered his
 nation's call to duty in 1952, enlisting in the Texas Army National
 Guard, and three years later, he joined the U.S. Army; after
 completing airborne training in 1959, he was assigned to the 82nd
 Airborne Division at Fort Bragg in North Carolina; he went on to
 join the elite Army Special Forces and became a member of the 5th
 Special Forces and the Studies and Observations Groups; and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Benavidez was deployed to Southeast Asia in
 1965 as an advisor to an infantry regiment in the Army of the
 Republic of Vietnam; one day, while on patrol, he was seriously
 injured when he stepped on a land mine, and he was subsequently
 evacuated to the United States; though doctors believed he had
 permanently lost the use of his legs, he remained determined to
 continue his military service, and in July 1966, more than a year
 after he was injured, he was able to walk out of the hospital; two
 years later, he returned to South Vietnam; and
 WHEREAS, On the morning of May 2, 1968, while assigned to
 Detachment B56, 5th Special Forces Group (Airborne), 1st Special
 Forces, west of Loc Ninh, Sergeant Benavidez heard a distress call
 from a 12-man Special Forces Reconnaissance Team that was pinned
 down by a North Vietnamese Army battalion of about 1,000 soldiers;
 he quickly volunteered to assist in an extraction attempt, and
 after reaching the battle zone, he ran through withering enemy fire
 to reach his comrades, sustaining multiple injuries; despite
 agonizing pain, he loaded the wounded and dead members of the team
 onto the aircraft, but then the pilot was killed and the helicopter
 crashed; Sergeant Benavidez quickly called in tactical air strikes
 and directed fire from supporting gunships, enabling another
 extraction helicopter to land; over the course of the six-hour
 fight, he received dozens of bullet, bayonet, and shrapnel wounds,
 and his valiant actions saved the lives of at least eight men and
 prevented classified documents from falling into enemy hands; and
 WHEREAS, In recognition of his heroism, Sergeant Benavidez
 was presented with the Medal of Honor by President Ronald Reagan on
 February 24, 1981; this courageous Texan was also the recipient of
 the Purple Heart with four oak-leaf clusters, the Defense
 Meritorious Service Medal, the Meritorious Service Medal, the Army
 Commendation Medal, and the Vietnam Service Medal with four
 campaign stars; and
 WHEREAS, After retiring with the rank of master sergeant in
 1976, Roy Benavidez returned home to his wife, Hilaria, and their
 three children in El Campo; during the ensuing years, he spoke often
 at the invitation of schools, military and civic groups, and
 businesses, and he wrote several books recounting his life
 experiences, including The Three Wars of Roy Benavidez and Medal of
 Honor: A Vietnam Warrior's Story; he passed away on November 29,
 1998, at the age of 63; and
 WHEREAS, Through his unfaltering courage and devotion to
 duty, Master Sergeant Benavidez exemplified the highest ideals of
 the U.S. armed forces; his actions and accomplishments are an
 inspiration to all Americans, and he is truly deserving of special
 recognition for his notable contributions as a soldier and patriot;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of U.S. Army Master Sergeant Roy P.
 Benavidez and to his exceptional service in behalf of his nation.
 Stephenson
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 76 was adopted by the House on April
 6, 2017, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 76 was adopted by the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor