Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR86 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2017
Bill April 21, 2017