E | 04/19/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1768 | |
E | 04/11/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1475 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 962 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 721 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 869 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 869 | |
House | 03/03/2017 | Filed |