E | 05/30/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 6063 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3567 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5092 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5095 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4360 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2455 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2455 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2455 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2455 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2455 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2455 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2454 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2113 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1800 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1800 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1699 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2670 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#852 | Journal Page: 2669 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 2669 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Amended | 1-Goldman | Journal Page: 2668 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2668 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2665 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2665 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed |