Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR100 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Kuempel, Gutierrez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.J.R. No. 100
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
3- May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4- Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.J.R. No. 100
72
83
9- HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
4+ A JOINT RESOLUTION
105 proposing a constitutional amendment on professional sports team
116 charitable foundations conducting charitable raffles.
127 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
138 SECTION 1. Section 47(d-1), Article III, Texas
149 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
1510 (d-1) The legislature by general law may permit a
1611 professional sports team charitable foundation to conduct
1712 charitable raffles under the terms and conditions imposed by
1813 general law. The law may authorize the charitable foundation to pay
1914 with the raffle proceeds reasonable advertising, promotional, and
2015 administrative expenses. A law enacted under this subsection
2116 applies [may apply] only to an entity [that is] defined as a
2217 professional sports team charitable foundation under that law [on
2318 January 1, 2016,] and may only allow charitable raffles to be
2419 conducted at games hosted at the home venue of the professional
2520 sports team associated with a professional sports team charitable
2621 foundation. In this subsection, "professional sports team" means:
2722 (1) a team organized in this state that is a member of
2823 Major League Baseball, the National Basketball Association, the
2924 National Hockey League, the National Football League, Major League
3025 Soccer, the American Hockey League, the East Coast Hockey League,
3126 the American Association of Independent Professional Baseball, the
3227 Atlantic League of Professional Baseball, Minor League Baseball,
3328 the National Basketball Association Development League, the
3429 National Women's Soccer League, the Major Arena Soccer League, the
3530 United Soccer League, or the Women's National Basketball
3631 Association;
3732 (2) a person hosting a motorsports racing team event
3833 sanctioned by the National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing
3934 (NASCAR), INDYCar, or another nationally recognized motorsports
4035 racing association at a venue in this state with a permanent seating
4136 capacity of not less than 75,000;
4237 (3) an organization hosting a Professional Golf
4338 Association event; or
4439 (4) any other professional sports team defined by law.
4540 SECTION 2. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
4641 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
4742 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
4843 proposition: "The constitutional amendment on professional sports
4944 team charitable foundations conducting charitable raffles."
50- * * * * *
45+ ______________________________ ______________________________
46+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
47+ I certify that H.J.R. No. 100 was passed by the House on May
48+ 5, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 110, Nays 12, 2 present, not
49+ voting.
50+ ______________________________
51+ Chief Clerk of the House
52+ I certify that H.J.R. No. 100 was passed by the Senate on May
53+ 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 6.
54+ ______________________________
55+ Secretary of the Senate
56+ RECEIVED: _____________________
57+ Date
58+ _____________________
59+ Secretary of State