1 | 1 | | 85R9784 CJC-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Workman H.J.R. No. 101 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | 6 | | proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating a portion of the |
---|
7 | 7 | | revenue derived from the state sales and use tax to the Texas Water |
---|
8 | 8 | | Development Fund II. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by |
---|
11 | 11 | | adding Section 7-e to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 7-e. (a) Subject to Subsections (b), (e), and (f) of |
---|
13 | 13 | | this section, in each state fiscal year, the comptroller of public |
---|
14 | 14 | | accounts shall deposit to the credit of a separate account in the |
---|
15 | 15 | | Texas Water Development Fund II $1 billion of the net revenue |
---|
16 | 16 | | derived from the imposition of the state sales and use tax on the |
---|
17 | 17 | | sale, storage, use, or other consumption in this state of taxable |
---|
18 | 18 | | items under Chapter 151, Tax Code, or its successor, that exceeds |
---|
19 | 19 | | the first $30.5 billion of that revenue coming into the treasury in |
---|
20 | 20 | | that state fiscal year. For purposes of determining when $30.5 |
---|
21 | 21 | | billion of that revenue has come into the treasury in a state fiscal |
---|
22 | 22 | | year, the comptroller of public accounts shall include revenue from |
---|
23 | 23 | | the same source coming into the treasury that, under Section 7-c of |
---|
24 | 24 | | this article, is required to be deposited to the credit of the state |
---|
25 | 25 | | highway fund in each state fiscal year. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a) of this section, the |
---|
27 | 27 | | comptroller of public accounts may not make a deposit required |
---|
28 | 28 | | under that subsection if, as a result of the deposit, the balance of |
---|
29 | 29 | | the Texas Water Development Fund II would exceed $4 billion. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) Money deposited to the credit of the Texas Water |
---|
31 | 31 | | Development Fund II under this section may be used by the Texas |
---|
32 | 32 | | Water Development Board or that board's successor in function only |
---|
33 | 33 | | for constructing and operating: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (1) a seawater desalination project; or |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) an aquifer storage and recovery project as defined |
---|
36 | 36 | | by Chapter 27, Water Code, or its successor. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (d) The legislature by adoption of a concurrent resolution |
---|
38 | 38 | | approved by a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house |
---|
39 | 39 | | of the legislature may direct the comptroller of public accounts to |
---|
40 | 40 | | reduce the amount of money deposited under Subsection (a) of this |
---|
41 | 41 | | section. The comptroller may be directed to make that reduction |
---|
42 | 42 | | only: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) in the state fiscal year in which the resolution is |
---|
44 | 44 | | adopted, or in either of the following two state fiscal years; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) by an amount or percentage that does not result in |
---|
46 | 46 | | a reduction of more than 50 percent of the amount that would |
---|
47 | 47 | | otherwise be deposited under that subsection in the affected state |
---|
48 | 48 | | fiscal year. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (e) Subject to Subsection (f) of this section, the duty of |
---|
50 | 50 | | the comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under |
---|
51 | 51 | | Subsection (a) of this section expires August 31, 2034. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (f) The legislature by adoption of a concurrent resolution |
---|
53 | 53 | | approved by a record vote of a majority of the members of each house |
---|
54 | 54 | | of the legislature may extend, in 10-year increments, the duty of |
---|
55 | 55 | | the comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under |
---|
56 | 56 | | Subsection (a) of this section beyond the applicable date |
---|
57 | 57 | | prescribed by Subsection (e) of this section. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (g) This section expires September 15, 2034, if on or before |
---|
59 | 59 | | August 31 of that year: |
---|
60 | 60 | | (1) a project described by Subsection (c) of this |
---|
61 | 61 | | section, the costs for which are paid by the Texas Water Development |
---|
62 | 62 | | Board or that board's successor in function using money deposited |
---|
63 | 63 | | under Subsection (a) of this section, is not under active |
---|
64 | 64 | | construction or operational; and |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) the legislature has not extended the duty of the |
---|
66 | 66 | | comptroller of public accounts to make the deposit under Subsection |
---|
67 | 67 | | (a) of this section in the manner provided by Subsection (f) of this |
---|
68 | 68 | | section. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (h) On September 1 of the year in which this section expires |
---|
70 | 70 | | under Subsection (g) of this section: |
---|
71 | 71 | | (1) the comptroller of public accounts shall determine |
---|
72 | 72 | | the amount of money in the Texas Water Development Fund II |
---|
73 | 73 | | attributable to deposits made under Subsection (a) of this section; |
---|
74 | 74 | | and |
---|
75 | 75 | | (2) the Texas Water Development Board or that board's |
---|
76 | 76 | | successor in function shall transfer the amount determined under |
---|
77 | 77 | | Subdivision (1) of this subsection from the Texas Water Development |
---|
78 | 78 | | Fund II to the State Water Implementation Fund for Texas. |
---|
79 | 79 | | (i) Subsections (g) and (h) of this section expire October |
---|
80 | 80 | | 1, 2034, unless this section expires in accordance with Subsection |
---|
81 | 81 | | (g) of this section. |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
83 | 83 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
84 | 84 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies |
---|
85 | 85 | | to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature, |
---|
86 | 86 | | Regular Session, 2017, dedicating a portion of the revenue derived |
---|
87 | 87 | | from the state sales and use tax to the Texas Water Development Fund |
---|
88 | 88 | | II. |
---|
89 | 89 | | (b) Section 7-e, Article VIII, of this constitution takes |
---|
90 | 90 | | effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (c) This temporary provision expires September 1, 2022. |
---|
92 | 92 | | SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
93 | 93 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017. |
---|
94 | 94 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
95 | 95 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain |
---|
96 | 96 | | sales and use tax revenue to the Texas Water Development Fund II to |
---|
97 | 97 | | provide funding for increased water supply and water quality |
---|
98 | 98 | | enhancement." |
---|