Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR101 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/07/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R9784 CJC-D
 By: Workman H.J.R. No. 101


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating a portion of the
 revenue derived from the state sales and use tax to the Texas Water
 Development Fund II.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-e to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-e.  (a) Subject to Subsections (b), (e), and (f) of
 this section, in each state fiscal year, the comptroller of public
 accounts shall deposit to the credit of a separate account in the
 Texas Water Development Fund II $1 billion of the net revenue
 derived from the imposition of the state sales and use tax on the
 sale, storage, use, or other consumption in this state of taxable
 items under Chapter 151, Tax Code, or its successor, that exceeds
 the first $30.5 billion of that revenue coming into the treasury in
 that state fiscal year. For purposes of determining when $30.5
 billion of that revenue has come into the treasury in a state fiscal
 year, the comptroller of public accounts shall include revenue from
 the same source coming into the treasury that, under Section 7-c of
 this article, is required to be deposited to the credit of the state
 highway fund in each state fiscal year.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) of this section, the
 comptroller of public accounts may not make a deposit required
 under that subsection if, as a result of the deposit, the balance of
 the Texas Water Development Fund II would exceed $4 billion.
 (c)  Money deposited to the credit of the Texas Water
 Development Fund II under this section may be used by the Texas
 Water Development Board or that board's successor in function only
 for constructing and operating:
 (1)  a seawater desalination project; or
 (2)  an aquifer storage and recovery project as defined
 by Chapter 27, Water Code, or its successor.
 (d)  The legislature by adoption of a concurrent resolution
 approved by a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house
 of the legislature may direct the comptroller of public accounts to
 reduce the amount of money deposited under Subsection (a) of this
 section.  The comptroller may be directed to make that reduction
 only:
 (1)  in the state fiscal year in which the resolution is
 adopted, or in either of the following two state fiscal years; and
 (2)  by an amount or percentage that does not result in
 a reduction of more than 50 percent of the amount that would
 otherwise be deposited under that subsection in the affected state
 fiscal year.
 (e)  Subject to Subsection (f) of this section, the duty of
 the comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under
 Subsection (a) of this section expires August 31, 2034.
 (f)  The legislature by adoption of a concurrent resolution
 approved by a record vote of a majority of the members of each house
 of the legislature may extend, in 10-year increments, the duty of
 the comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under
 Subsection (a) of this section beyond the applicable date
 prescribed by Subsection (e) of this section.
 (g)  This section expires September 15, 2034, if on or before
 August 31 of that year:
 (1)  a project described by Subsection (c) of this
 section, the costs for which are paid by the Texas Water Development
 Board or that board's successor in function using money deposited
 under Subsection (a) of this section, is not under active
 construction or operational; and
 (2)  the legislature has not extended the duty of the
 comptroller of public accounts to make the deposit under Subsection
 (a) of this section in the manner provided by Subsection (f) of this
 section.
 (h)  On September 1 of the year in which this section expires
 under Subsection (g) of this section:
 (1)  the comptroller of public accounts shall determine
 the amount of money in the Texas Water Development Fund II
 attributable to deposits made under Subsection (a) of this section;
 and
 (2)  the Texas Water Development Board or that board's
 successor in function shall transfer the amount determined under
 Subdivision (1) of this subsection from the Texas Water Development
 Fund II to the State Water Implementation Fund for Texas.
 (i)  Subsections (g) and (h) of this section expire October
 1, 2034, unless this section expires in accordance with Subsection
 (g) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2017, dedicating a portion of the revenue derived
 from the state sales and use tax to the Texas Water Development Fund
 II.
 (b)  Section 7-e, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2019.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain
 sales and use tax revenue to the Texas Water Development Fund II to
 provide funding for increased water supply and water quality
 enhancement."