Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR19 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/14/2016

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R1875 GRM-D
 By: Raymond H.J.R. No. 19


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the taxation of
 the sale or use of certain prescription medicine.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 26 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.  The legislature may not enact a general law that
 would impose a state tax on the sale or use of a prescription
 medicine that was not subject to taxation under Chapter 151, Tax
 Code, on January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 85th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2017, prohibiting the taxation of the sale or use
 of certain prescription medicine.
 (b)  This temporary provision expires December 31, 2019.
 (c)  If the 85th Legislature, during the regular or a special
 session, enacts a general law prohibited by Section 26, Article
 VIII, of this constitution, the portion of the general law that
 violates that section expires January 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment prohibiting the
 taxation of the sale or use of certain prescription medicine."