E | 05/24/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 5095 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2479 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4174 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4176 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3888 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2144 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#691 | Journal Page: 2376 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 611 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 611 | |
House | 11/30/2016 | Filed |