Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR37 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Johnson of Dallas (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.J.R. No. 37
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to legislative
 authority to permit credit unions and other financial institutions
 to award prizes by lot to promote savings.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 47, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d-2) to read as follows:
 (d-2)  Subsection (a) of this section does not prohibit the
 legislature from authorizing credit unions and other financial
 institutions to conduct, under the terms and conditions imposed by
 general law, promotional activities to promote savings in which
 prizes are awarded to one or more of the credit union's or financial
 institution's depositors selected by lot.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment relating to legislative
 authority to permit credit unions and other financial institutions
 to award prizes by lot to promote savings."
 * * * * *