Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1907 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3258 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1153 | Journal Page: 3258 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3258 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3257 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3179 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | RV#1120 | Journal Page: 3179 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3179 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3179 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 795 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 795 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Filed |