Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1380 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/01/2017

                            H.R. No. 1380


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The certain knowledge of a life well lived may help
 comfort the family and friends of Charles Ray Wilder Sr., who passed
 away on March 25, 2017, at the age of 61; and
 WHEREAS, Charles Wilder was born in Milwaukee, Wisconsin, on
 February 10, 1956, to Lillian Wilder and Luther Wingard; a graduate
 of Tipton Street High School in Kosciusko, Mississippi, he worked
 as a brick mason, and in his leisure hours, he enjoyed dancing and
 spending time outdoors hunting, fishing, and barbecuing; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Wilder shared a rewarding relationship with his
 wife of 27 years, the former Beverly Terry, until her passing;
 fortunate enough to find love again, he married the former Mae
 Johnson on April 8, 2015; he took immense pride in his five
 children, Shauntel, Kevin, Charles, Harold, and John, and his three
 stepsons, Orlando, Damon, and the late Tyran Johnson, and his
 family eventually grew to include two additional generations; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted husband and father and a true friend to
 many, Charles Wilder treasured the richness that each day brought
 during his time on this earth, and he will forever hold a special
 place in the hearts of those who knew and loved him; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Charles Ray Wilder
 Sr. and extend heartfelt sympathy to the members of his family: to
 his wife, Mae Wilder; to his children, Shauntel Malone and her
 husband, David, Kevin Terry and his wife, Imesia, Charles Wilder
 Jr. and his wife, Artesia, Harold Wilder and his wife, Farrah, and
 John Wilder; to his stepsons, Orlando and Damon Johnson; to his
 grandchildren, Darius Kimbrough, Anissa, Kentavious, and Ma'Kylee
 Terry, Derrick Fletcher Jr., Kaleb Malone, Seth, Chelsey, Morgan,
 Jayden, Janiyah, and "Baby" Wilder, and Harold Wilder Jr.; to his
 five step-grandchildren; to his great-grandson, Jeremiah Moore; to
 his father, Luther Wingard, and his wife, Vernestine; to his
 sisters, JoAnn Guyton, Margaret, Sharon, Wendy, Kathy, Demertha,
 Mertiseen, and Ladon Wilder, Tasha Ferguson and her husband,
 Kenneth, Linda Rimmer, Teresa Carter and her husband, Glenn, and
 Debra, Tracy, and Trameshia Wingard; to his brothers, Ricky, Jason,
 James, and Ray Wilder, and Tony, Tim, and Stacy Wingard; and to his
 many other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Charles Ray
 Wilder Sr.
 Dutton
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1380 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 27, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House