Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1490 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/01/2017

                            H.R. No. 1490


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family, friends, and colleagues are joined by
 citizens across Texas in mourning the tragic loss of Assistant
 Chief Deputy Clinton Greenwood of the Harris County Precinct 3
 Constable's Office, who died on April 3, 2017, at the age of 57; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Houston, Clint Greenwood was born on
 December 22, 1959, to George and Mary Katherine Greenwood; he
 attended Rice University, where he played on the Owls football team
 and earned his bachelor's degree in 1983, and he earned a juris
 doctor degree from South Texas College of Law in 1986; he began his
 career with the Harris County District Attorney's Office, and in
 1989, he established a law practice focused on representing police
 officers in criminal matters; and
 WHEREAS, In 2009, after operating the firm for two decades,
 Mr. Greenwood was hired as the police integrity division chief of
 the Harris County District Attorney's Office; four years later, he
 transferred to the Harris County Sheriff's Office, where he served
 as commander of the Office of Inspector General and the Internal
 Affairs and General Investigations Divisions; his superb
 performance in those roles led to his appointment as assistant
 chief deputy with the Harris County Precinct 3 Constable's Office
 on January 1, 2017; a graduate of the FBI National Academy, he also
 gave back to the law enforcement community as an instructor at the
 Houston Police Academy, the Texas Department of Public Safety
 Academy, and several other agencies across the country; and
 WHEREAS, Chief Greenwood enjoyed a rewarding family life with
 his wife, Leatha, and four children, Charles, Timothy, Catherine,
 and Lauren; and
 WHEREAS, Although tragedy has brought an untimely end to a
 life of honorable public service, Clint Greenwood will long be
 remembered for his devotion to his loved ones, his contributions as
 both an attorney and a peace officer, and his longtime dedication to
 the people of Harris County; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Assistant Chief
 Deputy Clinton Greenwood and extend heartfelt condolences to his
 family, his friends, and his fellow officers; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Clinton
 Greenwood.
 Oliverson
 Wu
 Straus Goldman Oliverson Straus Goldman Oliverson
Straus Goldman Oliverson
 Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega
Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega
 Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie
Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie
 Alvarado Gooden Parker Alvarado Gooden Parker
Alvarado Gooden Parker
 Anchia Guerra Paul Anchia Guerra Paul
Anchia Guerra Paul
 Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez
Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez
 Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan
Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan
 Arévalo Hefner Phillips Arévalo Hefner Phillips
Arévalo Hefner Phillips
 Ashby Hernandez Pickett Ashby Hernandez Pickett
Ashby Hernandez Pickett
 Bailes Herrero Price Bailes Herrero Price
Bailes Herrero Price
 Bell Hinojosa Raney Bell Hinojosa Raney
Bell Hinojosa Raney
 Bernal Holland Raymond Bernal Holland Raymond
Bernal Holland Raymond
 Biedermann Howard Reynolds Biedermann Howard Reynolds
Biedermann Howard Reynolds
 Blanco Huberty Rinaldi Blanco Huberty Rinaldi
Blanco Huberty Rinaldi
 Bohac Hunter Roberts Bohac Hunter Roberts
Bohac Hunter Roberts
 Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar
Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar
 Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis
Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis
 Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr. Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.
Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.
 Burns Johnson of Harris Rose Burns Johnson of Harris Rose
Burns Johnson of Harris Rose
 Burrows Kacal Sanford Burrows Kacal Sanford
Burrows Kacal Sanford
 Button Keough Schaefer Button Keough Schaefer
Button Keough Schaefer
 Cain King of Hemphill Schofield Cain King of Hemphill Schofield
Cain King of Hemphill Schofield
 Canales King of Parker Schubert Canales King of Parker Schubert
Canales King of Parker Schubert
 Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen
Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen
 Clardy Klick Sheffield Clardy Klick Sheffield
Clardy Klick Sheffield
 Coleman Koop Shine Coleman Koop Shine
Coleman Koop Shine
 Collier Krause Simmons Collier Krause Simmons
Collier Krause Simmons
 Cook Kuempel Smithee Cook Kuempel Smithee
Cook Kuempel Smithee
 Cortez Lambert Springer Cortez Lambert Springer
Cortez Lambert Springer
 Cosper Landgraf Stephenson Cosper Landgraf Stephenson
Cosper Landgraf Stephenson
 Craddick Lang Stickland Craddick Lang Stickland
Craddick Lang Stickland
 Cyrier Larson Stucky Cyrier Larson Stucky
Cyrier Larson Stucky
 Dale Laubenberg Swanson Dale Laubenberg Swanson
Dale Laubenberg Swanson
 Darby Leach Thierry Darby Leach Thierry
Darby Leach Thierry
 Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria
Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria
 Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris
Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris
 Dean Lucio III Tinderholt Dean Lucio III Tinderholt
Dean Lucio III Tinderholt
 Deshotel Martinez Turner Deshotel Martinez Turner
Deshotel Martinez Turner
 Dukes Metcalf Uresti Dukes Metcalf Uresti
Dukes Metcalf Uresti
 Dutton Meyer VanDeaver Dutton Meyer VanDeaver
Dutton Meyer VanDeaver
 Elkins Miller Villalba Elkins Miller Villalba
Elkins Miller Villalba
 Faircloth Minjarez Vo Faircloth Minjarez Vo
Faircloth Minjarez Vo
 Fallon Moody Walle Fallon Moody Walle
Fallon Moody Walle
 Farrar Morrison White Farrar Morrison White
Farrar Morrison White
 Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson
Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson
 Frank Murphy Workman Frank Murphy Workman
Frank Murphy Workman
 Frullo Murr Wray Frullo Murr Wray
Frullo Murr Wray
 Geren Neave Wu Geren Neave Wu
Geren Neave Wu
 Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler
Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler
 Giddings Oliveira Zerwas Giddings Oliveira Zerwas
Giddings Oliveira Zerwas
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1490 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on April 27, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Straus Goldman Oliverson

Allen Gonzales of Williamson Ortega

Alonzo González of El Paso Paddie

Alvarado Gooden Parker

Anchia Guerra Paul

Anderson of Dallas Guillen Perez

Anderson of McLennan Gutierrez Phelan

Arévalo Hefner Phillips

Ashby Hernandez Pickett

Bailes Herrero Price

Bell Hinojosa Raney

Bernal Holland Raymond

Biedermann Howard Reynolds

Blanco Huberty Rinaldi

Bohac Hunter Roberts

Bonnen of Brazoria Isaac Rodriguez of Bexar

Bonnen of Galveston Israel Rodriguez of Travis

Burkett Johnson of Dallas Romero, Jr.

Burns Johnson of Harris Rose

Burrows Kacal Sanford

Button Keough Schaefer

Cain King of Hemphill Schofield

Canales King of Parker Schubert

Capriglione King of Uvalde Shaheen

Clardy Klick Sheffield

Coleman Koop Shine

Collier Krause Simmons

Cook Kuempel Smithee

Cortez Lambert Springer

Cosper Landgraf Stephenson

Craddick Lang Stickland

Cyrier Larson Stucky

Dale Laubenberg Swanson

Darby Leach Thierry

Davis of Dallas Longoria Thompson of Brazoria

Davis of Harris Lozano Thompson of Harris

Dean Lucio III Tinderholt

Deshotel Martinez Turner

Dukes Metcalf Uresti

Dutton Meyer VanDeaver

Elkins Miller Villalba

Faircloth Minjarez Vo

Fallon Moody Walle

Farrar Morrison White

Flynn Muñoz, Jr. Wilson

Frank Murphy Workman

Frullo Murr Wray

Geren Neave Wu

Gervin-Hawkins Nevárez Zedler

Giddings Oliveira Zerwas