Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1542 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 1542
1+85R22776 KID-D
2+ By: Burns H.R. No. 1542
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever treasure their
67 memories of decorated World War II veteran Ervin Martin Koerth, who
78 died on October 8, 2013, at the age of 91; and
89 WHEREAS, Born on July 16, 1922, to Gus and Cora Koerth in
910 Nolan County, Texas, Ervin Koerth enlisted in the U.S. Army on his
1011 20th birthday; after attending parachute jump school at Fort
1112 Benning, Georgia, he became a member of the elite 551st Parachute
1213 Infantry Battalion, an unattached unit of 800 men that was assigned
1314 wherever it was most needed; and
1415 WHEREAS, In mid-August 1944, Paratrooper Koerth and the 551st
1516 took part in the Allied invasion of southern France; the unit
1617 liberated Draguignan against heavy resistance, capturing a German
1718 major general, and then took Nice on August 29; ordered next to the
1819 French-Italian Alps for several months and subsequently to northern
1920 France, the 551st was attached to the 82nd Infantry Division late in
2021 the year, when it joined the Allied counteroffensive in the Battle
2122 of the Bulge; Mr. Koerth, by then a staff sergeant and platoon
2223 leader, helped drive the Germans back at Noirefontaine, Herispehe,
2324 Dairomont, and Quartiers, enduring bitter cold and engaging in
2425 brutal hand-to-hand combat; on January 7, 1945, the 551st took
2526 Rochelinval, but at a terrible cost, with casualties amounting to
2627 more than 85 percent of its strength; by the end of its assault on
2728 the superior German force, the 551st numbered only 14 officers and
2829 96 troops; and
2930 WHEREAS, The battalion was relieved on January 9, and
3031 Sergeant Koerth, suffering from burst eardrums from the sheer noise
3132 of the bombs, mortars, and artillery, was sent to an army hospital
3233 for a month; while he was receiving treatment, the 551st was
3334 deactivated and all its remaining personnel were absorbed into the
3435 82nd Airborne Division; Mr. Koerth was assigned to the 504th
3536 Parachute Infantry Battalion of the 82nd and fought with that unit
3637 as far as the Elbe River; on May 2, 1945, the 82nd accepted the
3738 surrender of the German 21st Army; some four and a half months
3839 later, Mr. Koerth returned to the United States, and on September
3940 25, 1945, he received an honorable discharge; and
4041 WHEREAS, This intrepid Texan was awarded the Purple Heart,
4142 the Good Conduct Medal, the American Campaign Medal, the
4243 European-African-Middle Eastern Campaign Medal, and the Combat
4344 Infantryman Badge; the 551st was recognized with a Presidential
4445 Unit Citation for its actions during the Battle of the Bulge, as
4546 well as with the Croix de Guerre from the French government for its
4647 valor at Draguignan; and
4748 WHEREAS, After the war, Mr. Koerth lived for many years in
4849 Grand Prairie, where from 1968 until his retirement in 1978 he
4950 operated his own company, LESKO, which made parts for the aircraft
5051 industry; he shared a rewarding, seven-decade-long marriage with
5152 his wife, Lois, whom he married while on furlough in 1943, and he
5253 was the proud father of a daughter, Sandra; later in life, he was
5354 blessed with three grandsons, Brian, Bart, and Harlan Kickhoefer;
5455 Mr. Koerth passed away in 2013; and
5556 WHEREAS, During the greatest conflict of the 20th century,
5657 Ervin Koerth exemplified the highest ideals of the U.S. armed
5758 forces, conducting himself with fortitude, tenacity, and courage,
5859 and he has left behind a record of service to his country that will
5960 continue to inspire all those who knew and loved him; now,
6061 therefore, be it
6162 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
6263 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Ervin Martin Koerth
6364 for his heroic efforts in behalf of this nation during World War II;
6465 and, be it further
6566 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
6667 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
6768 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ervin
6869 Martin Koerth.
69- Burns
70- ______________________________
71- Speaker of the House
72- I certify that H.R. No. 1542 was unanimously adopted by a
73- rising vote of the House on May 4, 2017.
74- ______________________________
75- Chief Clerk of the House