Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1542 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2017

                            H.R. No. 1542


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever treasure their
 memories of decorated World War II veteran Ervin Martin Koerth, who
 died on October 8, 2013, at the age of 91; and
 WHEREAS, Born on July 16, 1922, to Gus and Cora Koerth in
 Nolan County, Texas, Ervin Koerth enlisted in the U.S. Army on his
 20th birthday; after attending parachute jump school at Fort
 Benning, Georgia, he became a member of the elite 551st Parachute
 Infantry Battalion, an unattached unit of 800 men that was assigned
 wherever it was most needed; and
 WHEREAS, In mid-August 1944, Paratrooper Koerth and the 551st
 took part in the Allied invasion of southern France; the unit
 liberated Draguignan against heavy resistance, capturing a German
 major general, and then took Nice on August 29; ordered next to the
 French-Italian Alps for several months and subsequently to northern
 France, the 551st was attached to the 82nd Infantry Division late in
 the year, when it joined the Allied counteroffensive in the Battle
 of the Bulge; Mr. Koerth, by then a staff sergeant and platoon
 leader, helped drive the Germans back at Noirefontaine, Herispehe,
 Dairomont, and Quartiers, enduring bitter cold and engaging in
 brutal hand-to-hand combat; on January 7, 1945, the 551st took
 Rochelinval, but at a terrible cost, with casualties amounting to
 more than 85 percent of its strength; by the end of its assault on
 the superior German force, the 551st numbered only 14 officers and
 96 troops; and
 WHEREAS, The battalion was relieved on January 9, and
 Sergeant Koerth, suffering from burst eardrums from the sheer noise
 of the bombs, mortars, and artillery, was sent to an army hospital
 for a month; while he was receiving treatment, the 551st was
 deactivated and all its remaining personnel were absorbed into the
 82nd Airborne Division; Mr. Koerth was assigned to the 504th
 Parachute Infantry Battalion of the 82nd and fought with that unit
 as far as the Elbe River; on May 2, 1945, the 82nd accepted the
 surrender of the German 21st Army; some four and a half months
 later, Mr. Koerth returned to the United States, and on September
 25, 1945, he received an honorable discharge; and
 WHEREAS, This intrepid Texan was awarded the Purple Heart,
 the Good Conduct Medal, the American Campaign Medal, the
 European-African-Middle Eastern Campaign Medal, and the Combat
 Infantryman Badge; the 551st was recognized with a Presidential
 Unit Citation for its actions during the Battle of the Bulge, as
 well as with the Croix de Guerre from the French government for its
 valor at Draguignan; and
 WHEREAS, After the war, Mr. Koerth lived for many years in
 Grand Prairie, where from 1968 until his retirement in 1978 he
 operated his own company, LESKO, which made parts for the aircraft
 industry; he shared a rewarding, seven-decade-long marriage with
 his wife, Lois, whom he married while on furlough in 1943, and he
 was the proud father of a daughter, Sandra; later in life, he was
 blessed with three grandsons, Brian, Bart, and Harlan Kickhoefer;
 Mr. Koerth passed away in 2013; and
 WHEREAS, During the greatest conflict of the 20th century,
 Ervin Koerth exemplified the highest ideals of the U.S. armed
 forces, conducting himself with fortitude, tenacity, and courage,
 and he has left behind a record of service to his country that will
 continue to inspire all those who knew and loved him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Ervin Martin Koerth
 for his heroic efforts in behalf of this nation during World War II;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ervin
 Martin Koerth.
 Burns
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1542 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 4, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House