Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR164 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/28/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 164


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their memories
 of Dortha Waddell Williamson of Junction, who passed away on
 December 26, 2016, at the age of 93; and
 WHEREAS, The ninth child of Kate Waddell and Elkin "Babe"
 Waddell, the former Dortha Waddell was born on August 7, 1923, at
 her family's ranch in Menard; she received her early education in
 the one-room Waddell Schoolhouse and later continued her studies in
 town, where she and her friends Doris Lankford and Reta Crowell
 became known as the "Rat Pack"; and
 WHEREAS, Shortly before the outbreak of World War II, she met
 the love of her life, Loyd "Butch" Williamson, at a Race Meet dance
 in Junction; the couple married on September 6, 1942, and went on to
 share a rewarding union that spanned 54 years before
 Mr. Williamson's passing in 1996; she was deeply devoted to her two
 daughters, Delia and Rana, and to her surrogate sons, Adolfo,
 Sergio, and Ivan Ponce; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Williamson operated Buster's Laundry and
 Cleaners with her husband and took an active role in the community,
 giving freely of her time and talents to the Business and
 Professional Women's Club and the Texas Cattlewomen; moreover, she
 served as Worthy Matron of the Order of the Eastern Star Chapter 497
 in Junction and as president of the Daedalian Study Club, which she
 helped found; and
 WHEREAS, A fifth-generation Texan, Mrs. Williamson took
 tremendous pride in her family's history and often told stories
 about her parents and her grandparents, Daniel and Georgeanne
 Waddell and Alf and Charlcie Reeves; she was also an accomplished
 horseback rider and had a passion for felines, pretty shoes, and
 dancing; and
 WHEREAS, Known for her warmth, her kindness, and her
 resilience, Dortha Williamson led a caring and purposeful life, and
 those who were fortunate enough to know her will forever hold her
 close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Dortha Waddell
 Williamson and extend deepest condolences to the members of her
 family and to her friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Dortha
 Waddell Williamson.
 Murr
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 164 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on February 23, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House