Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1918 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 1918
1+85R26912 BK-D
2+ By: Roberts H.R. No. 1918
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, The city of Spring lost two beloved residents with
67 the passing of Grace Faith Danielson Casagrande on January 3, 2017,
78 at the age of 76, and of her husband, Leo Albino Casagrande, on
89 March 31, 2017, at the age of 82; and
910 WHEREAS, The daughter of Dr. John Danielson and Grace Murphy
1011 Danielson, the former Grace Danielson was born on April 24, 1940, in
1112 Teaneck, New Jersey; she graduated from Iowa State University in
1213 1961 and exchanged wedding vows with Leo Casagrande the following
1314 year; the couple lived in Fort Salonga on Long Island, New York,
1415 before relocating to Derby, Kansas, in 1976 and opening a video
1516 store in Wichita; in 1990, they retired to Houston to be closer to
1617 their family; and
1718 WHEREAS, Leo Casagrande was born in Queens, New York, on
1819 August 5, 1934, to Ferruccio and Ida Salvador Casagrande; he earned
1920 a scholarship to play baseball at St. John's University, where he
2021 was named an Outstanding Student Athlete and featured in Who's Who
2122 Among Students in America's Universities and Colleges; after
2223 graduating with a bachelor's degree in personnel administration,
2324 Mr. Casagrande served two years in the United States Army, and he
2425 subsequently pitched in the minor leagues until an injury forced
2526 him to retire from baseball; he went on to receive a master of
2627 business administration degree from New York University before
2728 marrying the love of his life, Grace; and
2829 WHEREAS, Over the years, Mr. and Mrs. Casagrande became the
2930 proud parents of two children, Steven and Jean, and Mr. Casagrande
3031 often coached them in baseball, softball, basketball, soccer, and
3132 track; the couple took great joy in spending time with their family,
3233 which eventually grew to include three cherished grandsons,
3334 Michael, David, and Nathan; both husband and wife were active in
3435 their congregation at Christ the Good Shepherd Catholic Community
3536 and in the parish's 55+ ministry, and they were founding members of
3637 the Magnificent Seven; in addition, Mrs. Casagrande was a member of
3738 Friends and Neighbors of FM 1960 for 26 years and also shared her
3839 time and talents with the Houston Calligraphy Guild; and
3940 WHEREAS, Throughout the life they built together, Grace and
4041 Leo Casagrande set an inspiring example of devotion to their loved
4142 ones, to their faith, and to each other, and they will forever be
4243 remembered with admiration and affection by those who held them
4344 dear; now, therefore, be it
4445 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
4546 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Grace and Leo
4647 Casagrande and extend heartfelt condolences to all those who mourn
4748 their passing; and, be it further
4849 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
4950 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
5051 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Grace and
5152 Leo Casagrande.
52- Roberts
53- ______________________________
54- Speaker of the House
55- I certify that H.R. No. 1918 was unanimously adopted by a
56- rising vote of the House on May 12, 2017.
57- ______________________________
58- Chief Clerk of the House