Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1918 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/18/2017

                            H.R. No. 1918


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The city of Spring lost two beloved residents with
 the passing of Grace Faith Danielson Casagrande on January 3, 2017,
 at the age of 76, and of her husband, Leo Albino Casagrande, on
 March 31, 2017, at the age of 82; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Dr. John Danielson and Grace Murphy
 Danielson, the former Grace Danielson was born on April 24, 1940, in
 Teaneck, New Jersey; she graduated from Iowa State University in
 1961 and exchanged wedding vows with Leo Casagrande the following
 year; the couple lived in Fort Salonga on Long Island, New York,
 before relocating to Derby, Kansas, in 1976 and opening a video
 store in Wichita; in 1990, they retired to Houston to be closer to
 their family; and
 WHEREAS, Leo Casagrande was born in Queens, New York, on
 August 5, 1934, to Ferruccio and Ida Salvador Casagrande; he earned
 a scholarship to play baseball at St. John's University, where he
 was named an Outstanding Student Athlete and featured in Who's Who
 Among Students in America's Universities and Colleges; after
 graduating with a bachelor's degree in personnel administration,
 Mr. Casagrande served two years in the United States Army, and he
 subsequently pitched in the minor leagues until an injury forced
 him to retire from baseball; he went on to receive a master of
 business administration degree from New York University before
 marrying the love of his life, Grace; and
 WHEREAS, Over the years, Mr. and Mrs. Casagrande became the
 proud parents of two children, Steven and Jean, and Mr. Casagrande
 often coached them in baseball, softball, basketball, soccer, and
 track; the couple took great joy in spending time with their family,
 which eventually grew to include three cherished grandsons,
 Michael, David, and Nathan; both husband and wife were active in
 their congregation at Christ the Good Shepherd Catholic Community
 and in the parish's 55+ ministry, and they were founding members of
 the Magnificent Seven; in addition, Mrs. Casagrande was a member of
 Friends and Neighbors of FM 1960 for 26 years and also shared her
 time and talents with the Houston Calligraphy Guild; and
 WHEREAS, Throughout the life they built together, Grace and
 Leo Casagrande set an inspiring example of devotion to their loved
 ones, to their faith, and to each other, and they will forever be
 remembered with admiration and affection by those who held them
 dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Grace and Leo
 Casagrande and extend heartfelt condolences to all those who mourn
 their passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Grace and
 Leo Casagrande.
 Roberts
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1918 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 12, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House