Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1967 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/19/2017

                            H.R. No. 1967


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with the
 passing of Larry Huber Senkel of Houston on March 28, 2016, at the
 age of 68; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Woodrow Ernst Senkel and Beatrice Adele
 Huber Senkel, Larry Senkel was born in Dallas on April 22, 1947;
 after graduating from Monterey High School in Lubbock, he earned a
 business degree at Texas Tech University, where he was the
 president of the Phi Kappa Psi fraternity; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Senkel began his career with Continental
 Insurance in Dallas; when he relocated to Houston in the early
 1970s, he continued his rise to prominence as a leader in the
 insurance industry, eventually becoming one of the top surety bond
 brokers in the nation in his role as senior vice president for the
 Surety and Risk Group at Willis Towers Watson; and
 WHEREAS, A man of profound religious faith, Mr. Senkel met
 his future wife, Carol Lewis, at a Bible study meeting at Memorial
 Drive Presbyterian Church; the couple were joined in matrimony on
 July 20, 1980, and they shared a loving marriage that spanned more
 than 35 years; Mr. Senkel was the proud father of two children,
 Natalie and Nicholas, and later in life, he was blessed with three
 grandchildren, Anna, Lauren, and Woodrow; and
 WHEREAS, In his spare time, Mr. Senkel enjoyed waterskiing
 and traveling, and he was active in his community, working the
 barbecue pit at the Greek Festival and serving on the International
 Committee of the Houston Livestock Show and Rodeo; and
 WHEREAS, Those fortunate enough to have known Larry Senkel
 will long remember the way he touched their lives with his warmth,
 his generosity, and his infectious smile, and he will forever hold a
 treasured place in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Larry Huber Senkel
 and extend heartfelt sympathy to his relatives and many friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Larry
 Senkel.
 Coleman
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1967 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 12, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House