Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2309 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/01/2017

                            H.R. No. 2309


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A caring and purposeful life drew to a close with the
 passing of Charles E. Malone on April 28, 2011, at the age of 68; and
 WHEREAS, Charles "Chuck" Malone was born on March 3, 1943, in
 Fort Worth; this esteemed Texan enjoyed a successful career as a
 long-haul trucker; and
 WHEREAS, On August 18, 1989, Mr. Malone was joined in
 matrimony to the former Diana Aleman, with whom he shared a
 rewarding marriage that spanned 22 years; he cherished the time he
 spent with their eight grandchildren, Annalisa, Andrea, Abel,
 Alexia, Aliana, Sabrina, Isabella, and Indira; and
 WHEREAS, In his leisure hours, Mr. Malone took pleasure in
 working in his garden, growing vegetables like corn and asparagus
 as well as beautiful roses and other flowers; he also delighted in
 taking fishing trips to the Coastal Bend; and
 WHEREAS, Blessed with a loving family and admiring friends,
 Chuck Malone was a source of joy to all who shared in the richness of
 his life, and they will forever hold him close in their hearts; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Charles E. Malone
 and extend sincere condolences to his relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Charles
 "Chuck" E. Malone.
 Herrero
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2309 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House