Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2339 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2017

                            H.R. No. 2339


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life has drawn to a close with
 the passing of Charles Loyd Graham of Normangee on May 6, 2017, at
 the age of 74; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Houston on September 19, 1942, Mr. Graham
 was the son of George Graham and Mattie Ruth Graham; he served in
 the United States Navy from 1960 to 1963, and following his
 honorable discharge from the armed forces, he joined the Texas
 Department of Public Safety; held in high regard by his colleagues
 in the department, he rose through the ranks to become chief of the
 Traffic Law Enforcement Division in 2000; an inspiring leader, he
 set high standards for his troopers and helped them surpass their
 own expectations for achievement; many of those who worked under
 him advanced in positions of responsibility; he retired in 2002,
 concluding a distinguished career of nearly four decades; and
 WHEREAS, Charles Graham married Clara Lynette "Penny"
 Broderhausen on March 12, 1966, and they shared a rewarding
 marriage of nearly 50 years before her passing in 2015; the couple
 became the proud parents of two sons, Robert and Scott, and
 Mr. Graham knew the joy of welcoming into his family four
 grandchildren, John, Katelynn, Haley, and Aubrey; and
 WHEREAS, Active in his church and his community, this
 esteemed Texan maintained dual membership in two Masonic lodges,
 Rogers Prairie No. 540 and DeWitt Clinton No. 29; he was always
 willing to help others, and he frequently put his abilities as a
 carpenter and cook at the service of friends and family; from his
 earliest years, he loved the outdoors, and he enjoyed fishing,
 hunting, and spending time at his farm; and
 WHEREAS, Charles Graham brought to all his endeavors not only
 great skill but also the highest standards and an unfailing
 generosity of spirit, and those who were privileged to share in his
 love and affection will forever hold him close in their hearts; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Charles Loyd Graham
 and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn his passing; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Charles
 Loyd Graham.
 Ashby
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2339 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 25, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House