Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2499 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2017

                            H.R. No. 2499


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Peggy Butler Duda of Lockhart on November 14, 2016, at
 the age of 80; and
 WHEREAS, Born in San Augustine County on July 2, 1936, to
 Allie V. Quinn Butler and J. D. Butler, the former Peggy Butler grew
 up with the companionship of her two sisters, Joy and Shirby; she
 graduated from the Goodwin School in 1954 and went on to earn her
 nursing degree from Angelina College in Lufkin; during her career
 as a registered nurse, she provided care to patients in hospitals,
 nursing homes, and residences and especially distinguished herself
 through her skill in pediatric nursing; and
 WHEREAS, In 1982, she met Robert G. Duda, with whom she was
 joined in matrimony on February 2, 1999, and she took joy in raising
 a blended family that included her four children, Jordon, Jennifer,
 Jed, and Justin, and three stepchildren, Stefanie, Jeffrey, and
 Gregory; over the years, her life was further enriched by her 5
 grandchildren and 14 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Proud of her heritage, Mrs. Duda was a member of the
 Daughters of the Republic of Texas as well as the United States
 Daughters of 1812; moreover, she was an active member of the Texas
 Federation of Republican Women and the Caldwell County Republican
 Women and held life membership in the Republican National
 Committee; in 2007, she founded the Dictionary Project, and through
 the organization, she collected and distributed dictionaries to
 more than 6,000 third-grade students in Caldwell County; and
 WHEREAS, A valued congregant of the Tabernacle of Deliverance
 Church in Lockhart, Mrs. Duda was devoted to her faith, and in her
 spare time, she enjoyed reading and studying the Bible; she was also
 a talented cook and painter, and she counted sewing and tending her
 garden among her favorite pursuits; and
 WHEREAS, Although Peggy Duda will be deeply missed, cherished
 memories of time spent in her company will long endure in the hearts
 of her many loved ones; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Peggy Butler Duda and
 extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn her passing; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Peggy Duda.
 Cyrier
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2499 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 28, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House