Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2558 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2017

                            H.R. No. 2558


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Residents of Marshall lost an admired civic leader,
 educator, and broadcaster with the death of Frank John Lower on
 August 16, 2016, at the age of 74; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Kankakee, Illinois, on January 3, 1942,
 Frank Lower was the son of Frederick and Nellie Lower; he grew up in
 Colorado and completed his bachelor's and master's degrees at Adams
 State University before going on to earn his doctorate from Florida
 State University; on February 3, 1967, he married the love of his
 life, Jacquelyn Dean Lower, and the couple became the proud parents
 of three children, Laura, Malcolm, and Frank; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Lower taught at Georgia State University,
 Metropolitan State University of Denver, Union University in
 Tennessee, and Louisiana State University Shreveport before
 joining the communications department faculty of East Texas Baptist
 University in 1991; he served as chair of the department, and under
 his leadership, ETBU launched its annual Christian Writers
 Conference; following his retirement in 2006, he continued to teach
 part-time for four more years; he established a strong rapport with
 his students and was always willing to listen to their concerns; and
 WHEREAS, A dedicated journalist, Dr. Lower covered both news
 and sports for KMHT until his passing; he was extremely
 knowledgeable about county government, and his distinctive voice
 and passion for sports made his game broadcasts exciting for fans;
 he was an enthusiastic supporter of local teams, and he faithfully
 attended Marshall Lady Mavericks and Harleton Wildcats softball
 games, at home and away; win or lose, he offered kind encouragement
 to the young athletes, their parents, and their coaches, and he
 earned the affectionate nickname "Dr. Frankensports"; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Lower served on the board of the Marshall Depot
 Museum and worked tirelessly on projects such as the Santa at the
 Depot event; moreover, he served as president and as secretary of
 the Marshall Regional Arts Council, and he was an active member of
 the Marshall Lions Club; he gave generously of his time and talents
 to the Marshall Chamber of Commerce, acting as a judge at its
 FireAnt Festival and performing in plays he wrote at Wonderland of
 Lights events; in recognition of his contributions, the
 organization presented him with its annual Mover and Shaker award;
 he was a valued member of First Baptist Church as well; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to his family and his community,
 Frank Lower made a meaningful difference in the lives of his loved
 ones and fellow citizens alike, and those who were privileged to
 know him will forever treasure their memories of his
 thoughtfulness, warmth, and wonderful sense of humor; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Frank Lower and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his wife,
 Jacquelyn Lower; to his children, Laura Dean Lower and her husband,
 Daniel Dohner, Malcolm Frederick Lower and his wife, Brandy, and
 Frank Garrison Lower and his wife, Lydia; to his grandchildren,
 Aaron and Jacquelyn Dohner and Amelia, Emery, Makenna, Henry, and
 Maya Lower; to his sister, Jennifer Lower Weirick, and her husband,
 Vance; and to his many other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Frank
 Lower.
 Paddie
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2558 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 28, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House