H.R. No. 2698 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their memories of Claudette McInnis Thomas, who passed away on May 13, 2017, at the age of 75, and her husband, William John Thomas, who passed away on September 7, 2012, at the age of 82; and WHEREAS, During a rewarding marriage that spanned 45 years, Billy and Claudette Thomas operated a successful cattle ranch north of Raymondville, and they were valued parishioners of Our Lady of Guadalupe Catholic Church; moreover, they shared in the joy of raising two children, Mitch and Tonnyre, and doting on their five grandchildren, Morgan, Lauren, Logan, Royse, and Claudette; and WHEREAS, The former Claudette McInnis was born on May 22, 1941, in Brownwood to Claude and Lillie Mae McInnis; a graduate of Texas Tech University, she went on to earn her master's degree in journalism at Kansas State University and soon thereafter met her future husband, Billy; Mrs. Thomas was active in the American International Charolais Association and served for many years on the board of the Willacy County Livestock Show; she also volunteered her time on numerous other boards and committees; and WHEREAS, Born in Brownsville on August 26, 1930, to Maria and Harl Thomas, Billy Thomas attended school in Raymondville and studied at Texas A & I University in Kingsville; active in several agricultural organizations, he served the American International Charolais Association as director and as a member of its executive committee and the Pan American Zebu Association as president, and he was also an enthusiastic supporter of Willacy County Youth in Agriculture; and WHEREAS, Respected members of their community and beloved parents, grandparents, and friends, Billy and Claudette Thomas are deeply missed, and they will always hold a treasured place in the hearts of all those who held them dear; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Claudette McInnis Thomas and William John Thomas and extend sincere sympathy to their loved ones; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Claudette and Billy Thomas. Guillen ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 2698 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on May 29, 2017. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House