Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2725 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2017

                            H.R. No. 2725


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The city of Amarillo lost an admired civic leader
 with the death of Keith Roger Williams on May 19, 2017, at the age of
 65; and
 WHEREAS, The son of L. Keith and Bonnie Williams, Roger
 Williams was born on September 10, 1951, and grew up in Kansas City,
 Missouri; he completed both his bachelor's and master's degrees at
 Brigham Young University; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Williams was the proud father of three children
 by his first marriage, Stewart, Marissa, and Marshall, and
 following his marriage to Ana Estevez on December 26, 2003, he
 welcomed two more children, Nikki and Alexis, into his treasured
 family; moreover, he took great delight in his role as grandfather
 to Bailee, Ethan, Kai, and Landree; and
 WHEREAS, The face of Bell Helicopter in the community,
 Mr. Williams was one of the first staff members at the plant when it
 opened; over the course of his long tenure, he served in a number of
 key roles, including site leader, director of administration,
 executive director, and head of human resources; he was a kind
 mentor to numerous colleagues, and he was known in the wider
 community for his leadership in charitable organizations;
 dedicated to the United Way of Amarillo and Canyon, he helped raise
 more than $5 million as co-chair of its 2008 annual campaign, and he
 served on the executive board for a dozen years; he was a member of
 many other nonprofit boards as well; and
 WHEREAS, Sustained by a profound faith, Mr. Williams was an
 active member of First Baptist Church, where he even helped out in
 the nursery; following his retirement in 2012, he became deeply
 involved in the church refugee programs and drove vans to bring ESL
 students to their classes at First Baptist; he also devoted
 considerable time, effort, and resources to help people in need in
 Haiti; an avid scholar and voracious reader, he studied a wide range
 of subjects; he also loved travel and music and was a great
 supporter of the Amarillo Symphony; and
 WHEREAS, The life of Roger Williams stands as an inspiring
 example of service to others, and though he will be deeply missed by
 those he has left behind, they will forever treasure their memories
 of his magnificent smile, sharp wit, and boundless generosity; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of K. Roger Williams and
 extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn his passing; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Roger
 Williams.
 Smithee
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2725 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 29, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House