Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR292 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/02/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 292


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, For more than 180 years, across the Lone Star State
 and around the world, the Alamo and the brave men who gave their
 lives in its defense during the Texas War for Independence have been
 inspiring symbols of the struggle for liberty and the right of free
 people to self-determination; and
 WHEREAS, In 1718, Fray Antonio de Olivares established a
 Franciscan mission in what is now San Antonio, and in 1744, the
 cornerstone was laid for the world-famous chapel that survives to
 this day; the building's use as a mission ceased around 1765, and in
 1803, it was occupied by Spanish colonial soldiers who called it "El
 Alamo," after the surrounding grove of cottonwoods and in honor of
 their unit's home base in Mexico, Alamo de Parras; and
 WHEREAS, After the Mexican War of Independence, the Alamo was
 occupied by troops of the Mexican army until December 1835, when
 Texan rebels led by George Collinsworth and Benjamin Milam seized
 control of the makeshift fortress; by February 1836, the Alamo was
 under the command of Lieutenant Colonel William B. Travis and
 Colonel Jim Bowie, who stood at the head of a group of some 200
 volunteers, among them the legendary frontiersman Davy Crockett;
 and
 WHEREAS, On February 23, 1836, the Alamo was besieged by
 thousands of Mexican troops under the command of General Antonio
 Lopez de Santa Anna, and for the next 13 days, the intrepid Texans
 within its walls held out with unparalleled fortitude and steadfast
 determination against overwhelming odds; in the early hours of
 March 6, the Mexican forces made a final assault, and the Alamo's
 defenders fought to the last man; and
 WHEREAS, Their courage, perseverance, and sacrifice inspired
 their fellow rebels, and six weeks later, on April 21, 1836, 800
 Texans and Tejanos under General Sam Houston defeated Santa Anna's
 army at the Battle of San Jacinto, winning independence for a new
 nation and paving the way for the creation of the State of Texas;
 and
 WHEREAS, On March 6, 1836, the defenders of the Alamo lit a
 flame in the hearts of all Texans, a flame of freedom that burns as
 brightly as ever it did on the day they made their ultimate
 sacrifice; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby honor the defenders of the Alamo and encourage
 all Texans to forever remember their courage and heroism.
 Villalba
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 292 was adopted by the House on
 February 23, 2017, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House