House | 03/17/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 659 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 659 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 571 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed |