Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR788 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/07/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R13559 BK-D
 By: Paddie H.R. No. 788


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The tragic loss of Terry Glenn Bailey, 54, and his
 wife, Pamela Hitt Bailey, 57, of Center on February 15, 2017, has
 deeply saddened their family and friends and the many people in
 their community whose lives they touched; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Center on March 13, 1962, Terry Bailey was
 the son of Millard and Charlotte Bailey; a self-made businessman,
 he found success in the logging and oil industries and went on to
 establish and own a multitude of different companies over the
 course of his lifetime; and
 WHEREAS, The former Pamela Hitt was born on August 26, 1959,
 to Charles and Ann Hitt, and she graduated from Stephen F. Austin
 State University with a degree in business; after marrying Terry
 Bailey on September 27, 1980, she became the anchor of their
 treasured family, which grew to include two children, Carmen and
 Dustin, and four grandchildren, Falon, Ivy, Trevor, and Taygan; and
 WHEREAS, This devoted husband and wife were ideal partners,
 and together, they invested in their community by turning over
 start-up businesses to budding entrepreneurs and purchasing land to
 build schools and churches; they were also the owners of a deer
 breeding facility in Center, and as lifetime members of the Texas
 Deer Association, they forged numerous friendships and made vital
 contributions to the deer industry across the country; with
 Mr. Bailey's larger-than-life personality and Mrs. Bailey's innate
 kindness, they shared a natural ability to uplift and inspire
 others, and they thrived on the joy of having a close-knit family
 and a wealth of cherished friends and colleagues; and
 WHEREAS, Although tragedy has brought an untimely end to the
 lives of these two beloved Texans, Terry and Pam Bailey leave behind
 a legacy of dedication to their family and their community that will
 be remembered and admired for many years to come; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the lives of Terry and Pamela
 Bailey and extend heartfelt sympathy to their relatives and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Terry and
 Pamela Bailey.